Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gallite, Cheryl L, Gallite, Keir J, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Keith A Ringelspaugh, Esq, against Lloyd, William, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a residential tenant eviction and past due rent case filed by Keir J. Gallite and Cheryl L. Gallite, as trustees of the Gallite Family Living Trust Agreement, against William Lloyd. The plaintiffs are the landlords of the defendant,...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT NOTICE REQUIRED BY THE FAIR DEBT ACT
Date: February 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Date: March 01, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Date: March 17, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR MONIES
Date: March 09, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: March 13, 2017MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 20, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: February 28, 2017ANSWER Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Date: March 09, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19560, Page 673, 2 pages
Date: March 17, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: March 20, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Date: March 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED 030217 Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Date: March 13, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: LLOYD, WILLIAM
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19560, Page 673, 2 pages
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEW SECTION ASSIGNMENT PER AO 2017-009 CASE REASSIGNED TO SECTION 39
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.