Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Holloway, Kassandra, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Royce C Haddad, Jr, Royce C Haddad, Jr, Esq, against Del Pino, Leandro, represented by Juan Garcia-Pardo, Kristin M Rhodus, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 8 (COUNTER) AND ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 57 W/O PREJUDICE
Date: March 07, 2022ANSWER OF Doc # 13 TO COUNTERCLAIM Party: HOLLOWAY, KASSANDRA
Date: October 02, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Doc # 15
Date: April 08, 2019ORDER GRANTING Doc # 17 MTN TO COMPEL WITHOUT HEARING
Date: April 12, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 16 PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 041119
Date: April 12, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Doc # 18 FOR 30 DAYS
Date: April 26, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 20
Date: August 07, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 21
Date: August 27, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 23
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 22
Date: September 30, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 24
Date: October 14, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 25
Date: June 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 57 W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA Doc # 56 W/ ATTACHMENTS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA Doc # 55 W/ ATTACHMENTS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 54 SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 53
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Doc # 52
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Doc # 51 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 50 PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 12022021
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 49 PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 11292021
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.