Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bryant, Barbara Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bryant, Spencer Grant, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Vol./Book 19550, Page 649, 1 pages
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO FILE DOCUMENTS
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: BRYANT, SPENCER GRANT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/08/17 930
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010217 10:15 Party: BRYANT, SPENCER GRANT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION (SRS) FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.