Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Advanced Chiropractic And Rehabilitation Center Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company, represented by James E Peterson, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 3
Date: October 24, 2017ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME 30 DAYS
Date: February 28, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 27, 2017PRIVILEGE LOG DEFENDANT'S
Date: March 27, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: February 17, 2017ORDER Doc # 5 GOOD CAUSE EXISTS TO ALLOW CASE TO REMAIN PENDING
Date: October 30, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 27, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 4 A- COPY NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 24, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 6 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: November 16, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 W/PREJUDICE
Date: January 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 7
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) ORDER FROM COURT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 6 (TELEPHONIC)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 5 GOOD CAUSE EXISTS TO ALLOW CASE TO REMAIN PENDING
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 3
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 4 A- COPY NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 2
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 1 /DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS Party: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.