Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Advanced Chiropractic And Rehabilitation Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Infinity Auto Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Advanced Chiropractic and Rehabilitation, Inc., as the assignee of Cedrea Kirkland, against Infinity Auto Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages not exceeding $5,000 for medical services provided to the insured...
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Date: January 17, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: December 22, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 21, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 21, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 21, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY 122816
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 22, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY 122816
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.