Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Advanced Chiropractic And Rehabilitation Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Daphne Robinson Shaw, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 21, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) FOR DEFT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: March 24, 2017CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPSOED AGREED ORDER
Date: March 24, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 21, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 22, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 03, 2017ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF AND Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 15, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: December 22, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 22, 2016NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 122316
Date: December 30, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 21, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) FOR DEFT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPSOED AGREED ORDER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF AND Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.