Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bryan S Jones, Esq, Samantha Darrigo, Esq, against Atlantic Credit And Finance Inc, Cane, Mike, Cannon, Anthony M, City Of St Petersburg Florida, Naas, Megan J, (total of 7) See All represented by Richard B Badgley, Ryan C Torrens, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 63
Date: January 20, 2020NOTICE Doc # 70 OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 30, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69 ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL
Date: January 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 62 Party: US BANK NA
Date: January 20, 2020ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 64 (AGREED) FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: January 27, 2020CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 65 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER W/ATTACHED
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT Doc # 48 IN OPPOSITION TO OBJECTION TO SALE
Date: July 24, 2019CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 58 Vol./Book 20701, Page 1920, 1 pages
Date: September 19, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 55
Date: September 17, 2019ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 56 W/ ATTACHMENTS --- COURT RECEIVED 091619
Date: September 17, 2019ORDER GRANTING Doc # 57 PLTFS MOTION TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: September 17, 2019CERTIFICATE Doc # 52 OF MAILING COPY OF ORDER ON OBJECTION TO SALE
Date: August 02, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 49
Date: July 24, 2019COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO Doc # 60 Party: CANE, MIKE
Date: September 30, 2019ORDER Doc # 50 ON OBJECTION TO SALE IS OVERRULED
Date: July 24, 2019OBJECTION Doc # 46 TO SALE
Date: March 21, 2019COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO Doc # 61
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 36 ORIGNAL LOST NOTE AFFD / COPY OF MORTGAGE
Date: January 10, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 35
Date: January 10, 2019CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 30
Date: December 18, 2018CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 59
Date: September 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 45 US BANK NA AS TRUSTEE
Date: March 12, 2019MOTION Doc # 54 TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Filed by: US BANK NA
Date: September 06, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 31
Date: December 17, 2018PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 44
Date: March 06, 2019ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 39 --- COURT RECEIVED 010819
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 47 072419 11:15
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 42 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 27, 2019ORDER Doc # 40 DEFTS MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER IS WITHDRAWN
Date: January 10, 2019DEFT- RESP'S PROPOSED Doc # 21 AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 33 ATTACHED RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 24 010919 10:45
Date: October 10, 2018NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 43 ***ESF PAID***
Date: February 27, 2019ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 34 RCVD 122718
Date: January 10, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 22
Date: September 24, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 23 TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 27, 2018MOTION TO AMEND Doc # 20 ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Party: CANNON, ANTHONY M
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 28 (CROSS-NOTICE) 010919 10:45
Date: November 19, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 27
Date: November 02, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 19 (AMENDED) Party: CANNON, ANTHONY M
Date: September 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 14
Date: August 24, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 4 AS TO COUNT II
Date: December 22, 2017FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 7 (PARTIAL) AS TO COUNT II Vol./Book 19933, Page 1607, 4 pages
Date: February 05, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 38 Vol./Book 20398, Page 603, 7 pages
Date: January 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 2 PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 100317
Date: October 03, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 26 RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 17, 2018STATEMENT Doc # 15 AS TO REASONABLE ATTY'S FEE
Date: August 24, 2018ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 6
Date: February 05, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 18 Party: CANNON, ANTHONY M
Date: September 13, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 5/12/17
Date: May 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT Doc # 16 AS TO ATTY'S TIME AND EFFORT
Date: August 24, 2018DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 13
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 12 VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE - NOT ATTACHED
Date: August 22, 2018ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 9 --- COURT RECEIVED 030818
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER DENYING Doc # 10 DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL (AMENDED)
Date: August 25, 2017PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT 042417
Date: May 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 011017 Party: ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC
Date: May 10, 2017RESPONSE Doc # 8 IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 06, 2018ANSWER OF Doc # 11 Party: CANNON, ANTHONY M
Date: March 29, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 25 RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL / EMAIL ADDRESS OF DEFTS COUNSEL
Date: August 21, 2017ORDER GRANTING Doc # 3 MOTN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR 60 DAYS
Date: October 03, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL
Date: August 04, 2017ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 072017
Date: July 21, 2017ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME 30 DAYS
Date: July 21, 2017MOTION Doc # 1 TO STAY PROCEEDINGS Filed by: US BANK NA
Date: September 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 70 OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69 ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 69ATTACHED COPY OF AGREE ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTFS COUNSEL | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 64 (AGREED) FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 65 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER W/ATTACHED | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 67 | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 67 | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 64(AGREED) FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 65PROPOSED AGREED ORDER W/ATTACHED | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 68 W/ATTACHED CONSENT AS EXHIBIT "A" Party: US BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.