Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Christina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph W Chambers, Esq, against Troup, Darrell, represented by Geogymon George, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 29W/PREJUDICEVol./Book 20465, Page 2457, 1 pages | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Doc # 28FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE BY PLTF | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 27 | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 26OF VIDEO DEPOSITION | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 25 | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER-NOTICE OF TRIAL Doc # 23(JURY) | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 22122018 W/ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FOR ISSUE | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL Doc # 24/ DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION EMAIL | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 21(VIDEO) | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST Doc # 20AND EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.