Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Melissa Alvarez, Esq, against Briones, Jhony Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
EXHIBIT 2 STATUS REPORT
Date: May 31, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: June 01, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Date: June 01, 2016NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Date: June 29, 2016EXHIBIT 3 ASSISTANT SECRETARYS CERTIFICATE
Date: May 31, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: May 31, 2016MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO Vol./Book 19589, Page 217, 5 pages
Date: April 12, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: May 31, 2016NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: May 31, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: May 31, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Date: June 01, 2016EXHIBIT 1 ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Date: May 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO Vol./Book 19589, Page 217, 5 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: BRIONES, JHONY FERNANDO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT 2 STATUS REPORT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.