Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mobile Auto Glass Repair Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by John C Murrow, Esq, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Paula A Post, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 23, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: May 31, 2016EXHIBIT B - INSUARNCE POLICY
Date: August 03, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: June 01, 2016ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT INVOICE
Date: May 31, 2016DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND STAY DISCOVERY
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT A - COPIES OF ORDERS FROM FLORIDA COURTS
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT A - APPRAISAL LETTER
Date: August 03, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 03, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: June 01, 2016NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: June 17, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: October 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT B - INSUARNCE POLICY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND STAY DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A - COPIES OF ORDERS FROM FLORIDA COURTS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A - APPRAISAL LETTER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 28 AND 29 OF COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.