Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Orbit Leasing Inc A Michigan Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Julia J Mckee, Esq, against Dubel, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 1 BALANCE DUE ON STIPULATION
Date: December 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 1 BALANCE DUE ON STIPULATION
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Vol./Book 19410, Page 1846, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: DUBEL, ANTHONY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: DUBEL, ANTHONY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.