Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas M. Ramsberger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 3
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE OF REDIRECTION OF SUPPORT Doc # 1
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 2 Party: IRSHID, SAMAH MOHAMMAD Party: SMITH, KYONN JEFFERSON
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET FOR LIEN
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW Vol./Book 19371, Page 1549, 1 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST-ADMIN SUPPORT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET FOR NON CUSTODIAL PARENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.