Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brandes-Sommers, Beverly Noel, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Decourcy, Collen, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic - Repeat Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS ETC Party: DECOURCY, COLLEN
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-REPEAT VIOLENCE 06102017 Vol./Book 19229, Page 1105, 6 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - REPEAT VIOLENCE (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officers RAMSBERGER, PETER, RAMSBERGER, PETER)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJ 05/31/16
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASES JUDICIALLY NOTICED
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION (SRS)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.