Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Myers, Philip C, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jason R Kobal, Esq, against Hernando Hma Llc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 29, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: July 18, 2016EXHIBIT SECOND NOTICE
Date: April 29, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: May 03, 2016FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Vol./Book 19273, Page 1805, 1 pages
Date: July 20, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: April 29, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: HERNANDO HMA LLC
Date: May 03, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: April 29, 2016CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL ORDER
Date: July 20, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Date: June 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Vol./Book 19273, Page 1805, 1 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL ORDER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 1
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: HERNANDO HMA LLC
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: HERNANDO HMA LLC Party: MYERS, PHILIP C
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.