Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gulf Coast Rehabilitation And Wellness Center Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Elizabeth Castro, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Gulf Coast Rehabilitation and Wellness Center, Inc., as the assignee of Anderson Santiago, against GEICO General Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages not exceeding $5,000, plus statutory interest, costs, and ...
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME Filed by: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: June 23, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 29, 2016ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME 30 DAYS
Date: October 17, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Date: November 15, 2016ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: July 06, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 29, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: May 03, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 25, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: April 29, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO
Date: October 07, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 29, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: May 03, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME 30 DAYS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME Filed by: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY AND OBJECTIONS Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.