Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anthony D Vamvas, against Amnet Mortgage Inc, City Of Saint Petersburg Florida, Hollins, Stuart B, Lake Icon Portfolio Management I Llc, Sayce, Russell, (total of 6) See All represented by Jordan R Wolfgram, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 2 ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: September 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 3- EXECUTED | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 3 - EXECUTED
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 2 ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 2ISSUED TO ATTY | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 1RETURNED WRIT OF POSS TO ATTY TO BE EFILED | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 1 RETURNED WRIT OF POSS TO ATTY TO BE EFILED
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 082517 | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 082517
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSIONParty: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.