Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gooding, Cynthia K, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Andy B Steingold, against 9035 Bryan Dairy Road Operations Llc, represented by Gitanjali Senapati Clark, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 3 071818 9:00
Date: May 21, 2018NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 2
Date: May 07, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 4 OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: May 25, 2018MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT Doc # 5
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 8 (JURY)
Date: September 04, 2018ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE Doc # 9 062519 11:30/JURY TRIAL 081219 9:00
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 13 BOECHER/SPRINGER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 26, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 12 (NORTHRUP)
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 11 (BOECHER/SPRINGER)
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES Doc # 10
Date: February 26, 2019LIST OF EXHIBITS Doc # 15 BY PLTF
Date: March 25, 2019WITNESS LIST Doc # 14 BY PLTF
Date: March 25, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 19 (BOECHER/SPRINGER)
Date: March 26, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18 (NORTHRUP)
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 17 (SUBSTANTIVE EXPERT)
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 16 (BOECHER/SPRINGER)
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 25
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 24
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 23
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 22
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 21
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 20
Date: April 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 26 OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: May 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doc # 27 OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPO
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 37 OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 36 OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 35 OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 34 OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 33 OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 32 OF NON SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 31 OF NON SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 30 OF NON SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2019WITNESS LIST Doc # 29
Date: May 10, 2019LIST OF EXHIBITS Doc # 28
Date: May 10, 2019AMENDED Doc # 38 WITNESS LIST
Date: May 13, 2019JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 40 DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Date: November 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 40DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 39 | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 40 DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 39
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED Doc # 38WITNESS LIST | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Doc # 38 WITNESS LIST
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST Doc # 29 | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 37OF DEPOSITION | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 36OF DEPOSITION | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 35OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.