Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hylton, Linda, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Timothy Shanahan, against 727 Speed Parts Llc, Bv Ulmerton Llc, Gearhead Performance Llc, represented by James L Price, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 2 AS CO-COUNSEL
Date: April 10, 2018COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 1 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 18, 2017DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 6 CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: July 05, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: July 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 6CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 7 | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 6 CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 8 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 7
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H) CASE DISMISSED | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 5 | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 5
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.