Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Second Round Sub Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Sarah C Daley, against Langlais, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Date: June 09, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: LANGLAIS, BRIAN
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 28, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: LANGLAIS, BRIAN
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: January 27, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 27, 2016ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: March 23, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: January 27, 2016EXHIBIT SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT
Date: January 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: LANGLAIS, BRIAN
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: LANGLAIS, BRIAN
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.