Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jeremy A Soffler, against Rose, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: January 27, 2016SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO JEFFREY ROSE / 16-BK-05134
Date: June 17, 2016ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: April 27, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2016FINAL JUDGMENT $1038.96 PRIN $233. COSTS Vol./Book 19171, Page 1363, 1 pages
Date: April 27, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: April 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: April 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2016NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED
Date: February 09, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: ROSE, JEFFREY
Date: January 28, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ROSE, JEFFREY
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 28, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO JEFFREY ROSE / 16-BK-05134
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $1038.96 PRIN $233. COSTS Vol./Book 19171, Page 1363, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE JDMT - ATTY TO SUBMIT ORDER
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.