Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Superior Auto Glass Of Tampa Bay Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Chandler P Irvin, against Geico Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: January 28, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Date: January 26, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: January 28, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 26, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 09, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS GEICO INDEMNITY
Date: March 09, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: May 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS GEICO INDEMNITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.