Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blue Ribbon Auto Glass Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Chandler P Irvin, against United Services Automobile Association, represented by William A Kebler, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Date: January 26, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 26, 2016NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 02, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 02, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Date: January 28, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OF PROCESS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC
Date: March 02, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 28, 2016JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Date: April 01, 2016DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 04, 2016ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Date: April 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION Vol./Book 19482, Page 1165, 11 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE W/COPIES NO ENVELOPES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.