Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Mcpeek, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 27, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 25, 2016NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Party: MCPEEK, JEREMY
Date: February 15, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Date: January 25, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: January 25, 2016DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: January 25, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: MCPEEK, JEREMY
Date: January 27, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: MCPEEK, JEREMY
Date: January 27, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: May 17, 2017ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE/120 DAYS
Date: May 24, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 2 W/O PREJUDICE
Date: October 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 2 W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 1
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) ORDER FROM COURT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE/120 DAYS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON THE DEFENDANT AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.