Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Brian Mario Bilodeau, against Mattern, Jennifer T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the County Court in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, is suing the defendant, Jennifer T Mattern, for damages. The action is for damages less than $5,000. The comp...
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: MATTERN, JENNIFER T
Date: January 26, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: MATTERN, JENNIFER T
Date: January 26, 2016COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 25, 2016AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 10, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 26, 2016STIPULATION-ORDER OF DISMISSAL Vol./Book 19175, Page 232, 2 pages
Date: April 28, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER OF DISMISSAL Vol./Book 19175, Page 232, 2 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: MATTERN, JENNIFER T
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: MATTERN, JENNIFER T
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT E-FILED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.