Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Safe Touch Auto Glass Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Lee Herson Davis, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Leonard E Clark, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN CIRCUIT CIVIL MEDIATION Doc # 14
Date: June 22, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 6
Date: October 19, 2018STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 15
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 9
Date: October 15, 2019NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 5
Date: September 20, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 11
Date: November 13, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 4
Date: September 19, 2018NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 2 2/19/2018 - 2/23/2018
Date: February 05, 2018ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 16 DEFT
Date: July 24, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: January 13, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 7
Date: March 13, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 10
Date: October 16, 2019EXHIBIT A INVOICE
Date: January 22, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 22, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 22, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 22, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 22, 2016INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK
Date: January 22, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 25, 2016NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM 020916 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 16, 2016ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: February 16, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 25, 2016RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 14, 2016DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 04, 2016RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 14, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 14, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 1 OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SECOND)
Date: August 24, 2017REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SECOND)-
Date: July 25, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE SUPP INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 17
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 16 DEFT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 15
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN CIRCUIT CIVIL MEDIATION Doc # 14
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 13 IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 11
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.