Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Allstate Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Michael I Udine, against Rivera, Marisela, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: July 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES CC MAILED TO ATTY 09-06-2016 NH
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $1294.15 PRIN $100.47 INT $300. COSTS Vol./Book 19263, Page 1620, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE W/ATTACHED DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST, SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF NOTICE AND COMPLIANCE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLURIES NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.