Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gore, Emily Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Miller, Richard Clarence, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doc # 1 FINAL INJUNCTION 072118
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON STATUS OF COMPLIANCE MONITORING
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON STATUS COMPLIANCE MONITORING
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJ 01/26/16
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HELINGER, JACK)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR AT MANDATORY COMPLIANCE HEARING 041916 9:00
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE 2/3/2021 Vol./Book 19076, Page 74, 7 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.