Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hescox, Sarah Marie, Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Hescox, Corey J, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryIv-D Foreign Judgment Registration - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL Doc # 6 OF MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN CASE CIVIL CONTEMPT- ENFORCEMENT Doc # 2
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3 2/13/2018 2:30
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Doc # 4 Party: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 5
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 1
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE (EXHIBIT 1)
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE DENYING MTN TO CONTEST/REGISTERING FOREIGN SUPPORT
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) AND NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 08/29/16 9:30
Judge: LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.