Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Coleman, Lori J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Coleman, Kent S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with POLLACK, FREDERICK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT Doc # 63
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 62
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 61 FOR THRIFT SAVINGS PLAN
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 60 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 59 OF HEARING 021119
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 57 PROOF OF SERVICE- NOT ATTACHED
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 58 OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING / FORMER WIFE'S VERIFIED MOTION
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 56 021119 10:30
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 55 FOR RECEIPT OF MILITARY RETIREMENT BENEFITS Filed by: COLEMAN, LORI J
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 54
Judge: POLLACK, FREDERICK L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.