Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by David L Reider, against City Of Clearwater Florida A Municipal Corporation, Coachman Creek Condominium Association Inc, United States Of America Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Williams, Edna, represented by Paul Richard Hull, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 1 092817 10:00 BY PLTF
Date: September 07, 2017NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 2 OF HEARING 092817 10:00
Date: September 27, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3 121817 3:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: October 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Doc # 6 | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Doc # 6
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING Doc # 5FORECLOSURE SALE/CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND FINAL JUDGMENT/DISMISSING CASE W/O PREJUDICE AND WITHDRAWING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTSVol./Book 19884, Page 1374, 2 pages | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Doc # 5 FORECLOSURE SALE/CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND FINAL JUDGMENT/DISMISSING CASE W/O PREJUDICE AND WITHDRAWING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Vol./Book 19884, Page 1374, 2 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION Doc # 4TO VACATE 071317 JUDICIAL SALE, MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION (RENEWED)Filed by: MIDFIRST BANK | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 4 TO VACATE 071317 JUDICIAL SALE, MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION (RENEWED) Filed by: MIDFIRST BANK
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3121817 3:00 (TELEPHONIC) | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3 121817 3:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 2OF HEARING 092817 10:00 | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 2 OF HEARING 092817 10:00
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.