Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Molly Emma Carey, against Capital One Bank Usa Na, The United States Of America, Valdes, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICECOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSIONRETD EXECUTED | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSIONISSUED TO ATTY | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURTTO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTIONAND ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION -MORTGAGOR | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.