Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barry S Fishman, against Butcher, Alison Marie, Costas, Amanda Rae, Costas, Brian J, Unknown Heirs Etc Of Rae Marie Carr, represented by Julia Kite Powell, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 14 (SECOND AMENDED)
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 13 SECOND AMENDED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 16 (SECOND AMENDED) REASONABLE
Date: December 08, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 15 SECOND AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: December 08, 2017NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 21 ESF PAID
Date: December 22, 2017CERTIFICATE Doc # 22 OF MAILING ATTACHED COPY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 26 | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 25Vol./Book 19942, Page 1707, 1 pages | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 26
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 25 Vol./Book 19942, Page 1707, 1 pages
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 24WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 24 WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 23 | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 23
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.