Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weaver New, Kimberly Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against New, David James, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST. JOHN, SUSAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY FINAL JUDGMENT TO OVS W/O CHECK
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION/ PATERNITY Vol./Book 19240, Page 1248, 1 pages
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 061416 10:45 PRO SE
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 020916 Party: NEW, DAVID JAMES
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER FORWARDED TO CLEARWATER FOR SERVICE BY PCSO Party: NEW, DAVID JAMES
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.