Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Petitioner, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Llamas, Rodolfo T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HELINGER, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic - Sexual Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES CC/SAO/CLW 12-30-2016 (NH)
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-SEX VIOL 12/9/2025 Vol./Book 19020, Page 527, 6 pages
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - SEXUAL VIOLENCE (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer HELINGER, JACK)
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS ETC
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS INJUNCTION 120115 Party: LLAMAS, RODOLFO T
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER NAME-FILE SEALED FROM PUBLIC VIEW
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASES JUDICIALLY NOTICED
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.