Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mobile Auto Glass Repair Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by John C Murrow, Esq, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Paula A Parker, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL
Date: May 13, 2016EXHIBIT C - STATEMENT
Date: December 22, 2015SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 11, 2016NOTICE OF ATTORNEY NAME CHANGE/ AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 02, 2016DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II
Date: March 02, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTFF (APPRAISAL)
Date: May 13, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 23, 2015EXHIBIT B-AUTO INS COVERAGE
Date: May 13, 2016NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 07, 2016EXHIBIT A - AUTO POLICY
Date: December 22, 2015ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Party: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 02, 2016OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 07, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: December 22, 2015EXHIBIT A-APPRAISAL
Date: May 13, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 08, 2016(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: October 12, 2016EXHIBIT B - ACCOUNT INVOICE
Date: December 22, 2015REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: December 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY NAME CHANGE/ AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTFF (APPRAISAL)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT B-AUTO INS COVERAGE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A-APPRAISAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.