Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Keystone Mobile Home Park, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hamilton, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA SCOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Keystone Mobile Home Park against Adam Hamilton for tenant eviction. The plaintiff, Keystone Mobile Home Park, alleges that the defendant, Adam Hamilton, has failed to pay the rent due on December 8, 2015. ...
SUMMONS - SERVED 010416 Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Date: January 08, 2016COMPLAINT EVICTION
Date: December 31, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Date: December 31, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) COUNT I PRO SE
Date: January 13, 2016EXHIBIT 3 DAY NOTICE
Date: December 31, 2015DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Date: January 14, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: January 13, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 13, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2015AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT
Date: December 31, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19056, Page 2086, 1 pages
Date: January 20, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Date: December 31, 2015FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 20, 2016EXHIBIT LEASE
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19056, Page 2086, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE FJ W/ENVS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) COUNT I PRO SE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010416 Party: HAMILTON, ADAM
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT EVICTION
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.