Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Valeria Obi, against Weidner, Sandra, represented by David E Platte, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC against Defendant SANDRA WEIDNER. The damages being claimed in this action exceed $5,000 but not $15,000, exclusive of interest and court costs. The Plaintiff is a Delaware Limited Liability Co...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT ACCOUNT INFORMATION
Date: December 23, 2015NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS, EMAIL
Date: July 26, 2016NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE WITH PRINTOUT
Date: September 27, 2016CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE
Date: December 23, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 011316 Party: WEIDNER, SANDRA
Date: January 16, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: September 27, 2016SUMMONS - SERVED 011316 Party: WEIDNER, SANDRA
Date: January 25, 2016ANSWER OF Party: WEIDNER, SANDRA
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS WITH ATTACHED BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: September 27, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 122415 Party: WEIDNER, SANDRA
Date: December 23, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE ASSIGNMENT
Date: December 23, 2015MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE NON-MILITARY
Date: September 27, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Date: December 23, 2015ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT 1 - BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: September 27, 2016STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FOR PAYMENT
Date: December 07, 2016DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: February 02, 2016ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT 2 - ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT / DISMISSAL Vol./Book 19512, Page 1410, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FOR PAYMENT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE WITH PRINTOUT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS WITH ATTACHED BUSINESS RECORDS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE NON-MILITARY
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT 1 - BUSINESS RECORDS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT 2 - ANSWER
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.