Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Grow Financial Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey J Mouch, Esq, against Chevannes, Aubray, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Grow Financial Federal Credit Union against Aubray Chevannes in the County Court in and for Pinellas County, State of Florida. The complaint alleges that the defendant defaulted on an Installment Note and Security Agreement...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT (B) NOTICE OF OUR PLAN TO SELL PROPERTY
Date: December 22, 2015MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 6 CHEVANNES, AUBRAY Vol./Book 20785, Page 1833, 7 pages
Date: November 18, 2019REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED 8/3/2016
Date: August 02, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT (C) EXPLANATION OF CALCULATION OF SURPLUS OR DEFICIENCY
Date: December 22, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 12/23/15 Party: CHEVANNES, AUBRAY
Date: December 22, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT (A) LOAN AND SECURITY AGREEMENTS AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Date: December 22, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 22, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (ALIAS SUMMONS) Party: CHEVANNES, AUBRAY
Date: August 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Party: CHEVANNES, AUBRAY
Date: March 10, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 2 TO KEEP CAUSE ON ACTIVE DOCKET
Date: September 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 6 CHEVANNES, AUBRAY Vol./Book 20785, Page 1833, 7 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 7
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 5 Party: CHEVANNES, AUBRAY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 4
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT Doc # 3 OF ORDER GRANTIGN PLTFS MOTION TO KEEP CAUSE ON ACTIVE DOCKET ---- NOT SIGNED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 2 TO KEEP CAUSE ON ACTIVE DOCKET
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 1
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE (ALIAS SUMMONS) Party: CHEVANNES, AUBRAY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.