Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with John Carassas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
This complaint is a legal action for tenant eviction in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, LSREF3 BRAVO (FLORIDA), LLC, also known as Bay Cove, is suing the defendants, Ryan Belschner and Harry Griswold. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant...
COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - COUNT I
Date: December 22, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Date: December 29, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 22, 2015INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 122915 Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN
Date: January 07, 2016DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Date: January 11, 2016FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19050, Page 229, 1 pages
Date: January 13, 2016ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: December 22, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 122315 Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Date: December 22, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 122915 Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Date: January 07, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 01/11/2016
Date: January 07, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 122315 Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN
Date: December 22, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: January 25, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 1/14/16
Date: January 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 1/14/16
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19050, Page 229, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 122915 Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 122915 Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 01/11/2016
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: BELSCHNER, RYAN Party: GRISWOLD, HARRY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.