Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wrd Lincoln Shores Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett Iii, Esq, against Michaels, Theresa L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: February 29, 2016VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2016NOTICE PURSUANT TO THE FAIR DEBT ACT
Date: December 22, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 22, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: December 22, 2015NOTICE THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 22, 2015DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG ANSWER,
Date: January 04, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Date: December 23, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: January 07, 2016SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 122615 Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Date: January 07, 2016FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 29, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER to invex Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Date: December 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 122615 Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG ANSWER,
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER to invex Party: MICHAELS, THERESA L
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PURSUANT TO THE FAIR DEBT ACT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.