Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Finch, Deneca, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Bunch, Carey, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SERCUS, JULIE L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryIv-D Foreign Judgment Registration - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RECLOSE NO ACTIVITY Doc # 1
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SERCUS, JULIE L)
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION CONTEST SUSPENSION PRO SE
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-REGISTRATION FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPY OF NOTICE DOR
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPY NOTICE REGISTRATION WITH ATTD MLD TO RESP
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
INTRO LETTER RE SUPPORT OBLIGATION
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (2)
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.