Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rodriguez, Angelina Marie, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nunziato, Armand, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic - Dating Violence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY ORDR RETD BY PO
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Vol./Book 19025, Page 2209, 1 pages
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN) DATA ENTRY ERROR
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE 121715 10:30
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJUNCTION 10/02/15
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE 111915 10:30
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.