Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ismazova, Botagoz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ismazov, Shavkat, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HELINGER, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES MLD 11/22/16
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Vol./Book 19025, Page 1217, 2 pages
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO FILE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/14/15 10:30
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.