Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Grgic, Valentin, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 1 W/ PREJUDICE BY Party: DISCOVER BANK
Date: March 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 1 W/ PREJUDICE BY Party: DISCOVER BANK
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE Vol./Book 19179, Page 1888, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 041116 2:15
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 041116 2:15
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS W/BUSINESS RECORDS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF PRO SE Party: GRGIC, VALENTIN
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER ETC PRO-SE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.