Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Trust National Association Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely In Its Capacity As Trustee Of Mfra Trust 2014-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kathryn I Kasper, against Pippens, Gregory K, Pippins, Yolanda, United States Of America, Unknown Party In Possession 1, Unknown Party In Possession 2, (total of 5) See All represented by Colleen Murphy Davis, Mark E Schleben, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 49 | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (R) Doc # 48WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLATION OF THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENSVol./Book 20657, Page 1491, 2 pages | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 47 | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 46ATTACHED COPY OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 45CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - CMC 092619 10:30 | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 44 | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 43(CROSS-NOTICE) 071819 10:30 | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 42071819 10:30 | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 41021819 10:15 BY PLTF | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 40OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.