Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jonathan Meisels, against Any And All Unknown Parties Etc, Covered Bridge Townhomes Property Owners Assoc, Mazurowski, Barbara M, Mazurowski, Michael H, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Aubrey Elizabeth Posey, Benny A Ortiz, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALOF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELS THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENSVol./Book 19300, Page 1319, 2 pages | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATEOF SERVICE OF COURT CORRESPONDENCE (ATTACHED) | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PARTIAL JUDGMENT(CONSENT) REFORMING MORTGAGE IN FAVOR OF PLTF AS TO COUNT IIVol./Book 19182, Page 2563, 3 pages | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REPROPOSED PARTIAL CONSENT JUDGMENT RCVD BY COURT 050216 | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWAS COUNSEL FOR DEFT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEAS CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OFParty: MAZUROWSKI, BARBARA MParty: MAZUROWSKI, MICHAEL H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.