Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Patricia L Assmann, Esq, against Us Bank National Association, Pinedo, Hammer, Morgan, Allison, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19308, Page 1, 1 pages | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEPAUL M HARGIS | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREVol./Book 19239, Page 1712, 7 pages | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.