Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Laura L Walker, against Schaneville, Kyle, Schaneville, Lori, Unknown Spouse Of Joseph Passalaqua, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All represented by Mark P Stopa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST. ARNOLD, JACK R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST. ARNOLD, JACK R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Doc # 34 | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 33Vol./Book 20366, Page 2572, 2 pages | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 32AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: SCHANEVILLE, KYLE | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 31US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT Doc # 30OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 29ATTACHED COPY OF BANKRUPTCY ORDER ON TEMPORARY EXTENSION OF STAY TO PROCEEDINGS | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 28 | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 27 | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 26***ESF PAID*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.