Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against James Shaw, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time384 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 1/04/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09 | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON JAMES SHAW. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $65.00 Not Applicable |
|
March 12, 2011 | Docket Event | PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/09/11, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09 | |
March 12, 2011 | Docket Event | PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/07/12, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.