Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Countryside Mall Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Donald H Crawford, Ii, against La Crepe Adria Llc, Kolundzic, Zdravko, Kolundzic, Dragana, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO COUNT II AND III | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO COUNT II AND III
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSIONRETURNED EXECUTED | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSIONISSUED 2/25/16 | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/25/16
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSIONVol./Book 19095, Page 1139, 3 pages | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19095, Page 1139, 3 pages
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING022316 10:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.